Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 11/18/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/10/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/10/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/10/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/10/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/15/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/15/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/15/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/15/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/15/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/15/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/15/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/16/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 02/16/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/29/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/29/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/29/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/29/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/01/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/09/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/09/2000