Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/05/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/05/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/05/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/05/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/05/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 04/05/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/05/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/05/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/05/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/05/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/05/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/05/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/05/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/05/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/05/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/05/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/05/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/05/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/05/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/05/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/05/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/05/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/05/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/05/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/05/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/05/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/05/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 04/05/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/05/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/05/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/05/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/05/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/05/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/05/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/12/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/12/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/12/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/12/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/12/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/12/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/12/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/12/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/12/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/12/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/12/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/12/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/12/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/02/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/02/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/03/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/03/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/03/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/03/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/03/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/03/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/08/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/15/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/15/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/15/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/15/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/15/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/17/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/17/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/17/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/17/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/17/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/17/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/22/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/22/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/22/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/22/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/06/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/06/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/06/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/06/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/06/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/06/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/06/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/06/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/09/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/09/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/09/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/09/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/09/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/09/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/09/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/19/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/19/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/19/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/19/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/19/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/19/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/19/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/19/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/19/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/19/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/19/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/19/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/12/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/12/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/12/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/12/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/12/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/12/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/12/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/12/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/18/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/18/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/18/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/18/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/28/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/28/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/28/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/02/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/02/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew