Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/09/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/09/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/09/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/11/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/11/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/11/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/11/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/11/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/11/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/23/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/23/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/23/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/23/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/23/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/23/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/23/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/23/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/23/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/23/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/23/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/25/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/25/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/25/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/25/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/25/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/25/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/02/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/02/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/02/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/02/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/02/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/02/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/03/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/03/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/03/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/03/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/04/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/04/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/04/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/04/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/09/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 03/09/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/09/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/09/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 03/09/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/09/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/09/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/09/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/09/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/09/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/09/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/09/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/09/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/09/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/10/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/16/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/16/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/17/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/17/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/17/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/18/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/18/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/23/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/23/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/23/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/23/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/23/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/23/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/24/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/24/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/24/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/25/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/12/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/12/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/12/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/12/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/12/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/12/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/12/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 04/12/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/12/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/12/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/12/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/13/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/13/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/14/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/14/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/14/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/21/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/21/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/27/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/27/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/05/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/06/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/06/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/20/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/20/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/26/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/26/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/26/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/26/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/26/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/07/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/07/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/07/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/07/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/14/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/16/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/17/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/17/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/24/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/24/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/24/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 08/05/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/13/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/14/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/14/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/15/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/15/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/15/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/23/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/23/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/23/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/27/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/12/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/12/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/12/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/12/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/13/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/13/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/19/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/19/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/19/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/19/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/19/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/25/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/25/1999