Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/02/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/23/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/23/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/23/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/23/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/23/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/23/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/23/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/23/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/23/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/23/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/23/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/05/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/05/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/05/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/05/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/05/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/02/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/02/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/18/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/07/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/07/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/07/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/20/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/20/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/25/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/13/2000