There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that there should be established a National Ocean Day to recognize the significant role the ocean plays in the lives of the Nation's people and the important role the Nation's people must play in the continued life of the ocean.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/11/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 387 - 28, 2 Present (Roll no. 381).(text: CR 7/10/2000 H5676)
07/10/2000Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-716.
02/02/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date All Actions
07/11/2000-12:44pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/11/2000-12:44pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 387 - 28, 2 Present (Roll no. 381). (text: CR 7/10/2000 H5676)
07/11/2000-12:35pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5765-5766)
07/10/2000-2:50pmAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mrs. Mink objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
07/10/2000-2:41pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 415.
07/10/2000-2:41pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5676-5678)
07/10/2000-2:41pmMr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
07/10/2000Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 252.
07/10/2000Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-716.
06/20/2000Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/20/2000Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/08/2000Subcommittee Hearings Held.
02/03/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
02/02/2000Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
02/02/2000Introduced in House

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Resources02/02/2000 Referred to
06/20/2000 Markup by
07/10/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-716
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans02/03/2000 Referred to
06/08/2000 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.415. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/11/2000)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that a National Ocean Day should be established.