Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/29/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/13/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/16/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/16/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/23/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/23/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/28/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/30/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/30/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/30/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/03/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/24/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/14/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/14/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/14/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/14/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/15/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/21/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/18/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/18/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/27/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/06/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/24/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/24/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/01/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/13/2000