Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/16/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/21/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/21/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/21/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/21/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/21/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/21/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/21/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/23/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/23/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/23/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/23/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/28/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/30/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/30/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/30/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/04/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/04/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/04/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/04/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/05/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/05/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/12/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/18/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/05/2000