Refine your search

Refined by:

Louisiana Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/05/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 10/03/2000