Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/06/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/06/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/06/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 06/14/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/20/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/28/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/06/2000