Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/05/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/05/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/05/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/06/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/06/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/04/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/04/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/11/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/07/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/07/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 06/14/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/15/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/15/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/20/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/20/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/20/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/20/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/20/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/20/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/20/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/28/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/28/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/12/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/06/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/18/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/18/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/18/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/03/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/03/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/03/2000