Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/05/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/06/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/06/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/11/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/07/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/07/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/14/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/20/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/20/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/20/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/20/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/28/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/12/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/06/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/06/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/06/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/06/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/18/2000
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/18/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/18/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/03/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/03/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 10/03/2000