Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/06/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/06/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/12/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/12/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/12/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 06/12/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/12/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/12/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/12/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/12/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/12/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/12/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/12/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/12/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/12/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/19/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/19/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/19/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/19/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/19/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/19/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/26/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/26/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/26/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/26/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/26/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/26/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/26/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/11/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/11/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/11/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/11/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/20/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/20/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/20/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/20/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/20/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/25/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/25/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/25/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/25/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/25/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/25/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/27/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 07/27/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/27/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/06/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/20/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/20/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/20/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/20/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/20/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/20/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/20/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/20/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/20/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/06/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/19/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/19/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/19/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/19/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/19/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/19/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/19/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/19/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/19/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/25/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/25/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/07/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 12/07/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/07/2000