Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 05/04/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 05/04/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/11/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/11/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/11/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/11/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/11/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/11/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/11/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/19/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/19/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/19/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/19/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/19/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/19/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/19/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/19/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/08/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/13/2000