Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 06/27/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/29/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/29/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/29/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/18/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/18/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/18/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/18/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/18/2000
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/18/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/18/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/18/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/20/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/20/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/20/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/25/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/27/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/07/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/07/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/07/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/07/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/07/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/14/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/14/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/05/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/05/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/05/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/05/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/11/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/25/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/25/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/25/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/25/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/25/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/25/2000