Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/13/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/13/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/13/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/13/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/13/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/13/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/13/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/13/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/13/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/13/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/13/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/13/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/17/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/17/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/17/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/17/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/17/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/17/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/17/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/17/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/17/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/17/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/17/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/17/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/17/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/19/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 07/19/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/19/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/19/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/19/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/24/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/24/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/24/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/24/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/24/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/24/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 07/24/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/24/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/25/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/25/2000