Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 10/17/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 10/17/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 10/17/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 10/17/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 10/17/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 10/17/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/18/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/18/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/18/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/18/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/18/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/18/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/18/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/18/2000
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 10/18/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [R-CA-31] 10/18/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/18/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/18/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/18/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/18/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/19/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/19/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/19/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/24/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/24/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/26/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/14/2000