Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/03/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/03/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/10/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/10/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/17/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/17/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/17/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/13/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/20/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/11/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/27/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/27/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/27/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/27/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/16/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/16/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/16/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/16/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/05/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/08/1999