Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/11/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/13/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/13/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/19/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/07/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/16/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/01/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 02/01/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/23/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/16/2000