Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 01/20/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 02/03/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/10/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/02/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/02/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/02/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/14/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/11/1999