Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/12/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/26/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/15/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/14/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 07/26/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/14/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/14/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/15/1999
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/15/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/21/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/28/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/05/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/08/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/27/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 10/28/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/28/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/28/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/28/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/28/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/29/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 11/08/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/08/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/18/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/24/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/07/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/07/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/06/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/28/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/30/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/07/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/11/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/06/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/07/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/12/2000
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/16/2000
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/22/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/17/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/27/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/11/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/11/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/12/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/12/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/12/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/12/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/13/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/13/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/15/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/15/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/27/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 10/04/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/06/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 10/10/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/12/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/12/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/31/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew