Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/22/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/22/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 06/22/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 08/02/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/21/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/22/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/22/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/29/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/19/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 01/24/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/03/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/08/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/29/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/02/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/02/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 05/11/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/11/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/11/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew