Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 05/25/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/08/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 06/08/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/10/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 06/15/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/30/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/13/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/15/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/15/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/21/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/21/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/22/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/08/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/16/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [I-NH] 09/23/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/28/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/29/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/29/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/07/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 11/02/1999
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/29/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/10/2000