Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/18/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/19/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/26/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/08/1999
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 01/31/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/13/2000