Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 05/18/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 05/18/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/18/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/19/1999
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/24/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 05/25/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/26/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/27/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 06/09/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/10/1999
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 06/14/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/15/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 06/15/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/16/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/22/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/12/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/15/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/28/1999
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 08/05/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/08/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/21/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [I-NH] 09/23/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/23/1999