Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/20/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/20/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/28/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/28/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/13/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/16/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/05/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/07/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/15/1999