Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/24/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 06/14/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/22/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/08/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/19/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/25/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/28/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 10/29/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/29/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 11/02/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 11/03/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 11/16/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 11/16/1999
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 11/18/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/18/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 11/19/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/19/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 02/07/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 02/10/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/28/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/07/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/07/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/14/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/17/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/27/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/05/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/05/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/05/2000