Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/22/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/24/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/12/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/12/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/13/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/13/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/19/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/19/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/27/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 07/28/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 08/03/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 08/04/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 08/04/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 08/04/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/14/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/01/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/05/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/07/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/18/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/18/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/18/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 10/20/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/20/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/25/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/25/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/25/1999
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 01/31/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/02/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/01/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew