Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/18/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/30/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/02/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/25/2000