Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/27/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/30/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/16/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/26/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/09/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/23/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/27/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 09/29/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 10/06/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/19/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/19/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 11/19/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 03/23/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 03/23/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/23/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 04/13/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/13/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/13/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/27/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/02/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/02/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/03/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/10/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/10/2000
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 05/23/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 06/13/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/29/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/29/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/20/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/14/2000