Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/21/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/21/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/21/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/21/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/21/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/21/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/21/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/21/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 10/21/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/21/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/21/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/28/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 10/29/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 11/01/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/05/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 11/05/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/24/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/06/2000