Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/27/1999
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/27/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/27/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/07/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/21/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/29/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/12/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 08/04/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 10/28/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/29/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/11/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/20/2000