Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 06/09/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/09/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/09/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 06/30/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/30/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/12/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/12/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/12/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 07/12/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/19/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/29/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/22/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/22/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/18/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/25/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/20/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/28/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/28/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/06/2000