Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/27/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/27/1999
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/29/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 09/21/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/30/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/28/1999