Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/10/1999
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 06/10/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 06/10/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/10/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 06/10/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/10/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/10/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 06/10/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 06/10/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/19/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/03/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 08/04/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 08/05/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew