Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/17/1999
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 07/13/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/13/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/13/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/13/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/13/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 08/03/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/21/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/21/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/28/1999