Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/23/1999
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/29/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 07/30/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 08/02/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 08/05/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 08/05/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 09/08/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/22/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 10/19/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/21/2000