Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/23/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 06/23/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 06/23/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 06/23/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 06/23/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 06/23/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/23/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 06/23/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/23/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 06/23/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 06/23/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/28/1999
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/28/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/29/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/29/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/20/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/20/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/20/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [I-NH] 07/20/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/27/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/27/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 08/02/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 08/04/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 08/04/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 08/05/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/08/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/16/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/21/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/21/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 09/28/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/06/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/10/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/16/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/17/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/01/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/01/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/10/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/06/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/06/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/29/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/04/2000