There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Lower Delaware Wild and Scenic Rivers Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Lower Delaware Wild and Scenic Rivers Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Lower Delaware Wild and Scenic Rivers Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Lower Delaware Wild and Scenic Rivers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate portions of the lower Delaware River and associated tributaries as a component of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/01/2000Became Public Law No: 106-418. (TXT | PDF)
11/01/2000Signed by President.
10/20/2000Presented to President.
10/17/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9981-9982)
11/19/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S15178-15180; text as passed Senate: CR S15179-15180)
11/02/1999Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-207.(text of measure as reported in Senate: CR 11/19/1999 S15178-15179)
06/28/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
11/01/2000Became Public Law No: 106-418. (TXT | PDF)
11/01/2000Signed by President.
10/20/2000SenatePresented to President.
10/17/2000-2:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/17/2000-2:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9981-9982)
10/17/2000-2:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1296.
10/17/2000-2:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9981-9983)
10/17/2000-2:44pmHouseMr. Calvert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/01/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
01/27/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
11/22/1999SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/22/1999-1:42pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/22/1999-12:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/19/1999SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S15178-15180; text as passed Senate: CR S15179-15180)
11/02/1999SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 363.
11/02/1999SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-207. (text of measure as reported in Senate: CR 11/19/1999 S15178-15179)
10/20/1999SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
10/13/1999SenateSubcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation, and Recreation. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 106-383.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation and Recreation
06/28/1999SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7724-7725)
06/28/1999SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7723-7724)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 06/28/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 06/28/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/20/1999
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/13/1999 08/03/1999 --

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/28/1999 Referred to
10/20/1999 Markup by
11/02/1999 Reported by S. Rept. 106-207
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation and Recreation10/13/1999 Hearings by
House Resources01/27/2000 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands02/01/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1296.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1296. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/19/1999)

Lower Delaware Wild and Scenic Rivers Act - Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate specified segments of the Lower Delaware River and associated tributaries in New Jersey and Pennsylvania for inclusion in the Wild and Scenic Rivers System.

Requires such segments to be managed: (1) in accordance with the Lower Delaware River management plan which ensures the long-term protection of the River's values and the compatible management of land and water resources associated with the River; and (2) in cooperation with appropriate Federal, State, regional, and local agencies.

Authorizes the Secretary: (1) to provide planning, financial, and technical assistance to affected local municipalities to protect the natural, economic, and historic resources of the segments; and (2) if adequate local support to add certain additional segments to the System is found, to publish a notice of such designation, after which such segments shall be so included.

Authorizes appropriations.