Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/01/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/01/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/01/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/13/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/18/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/26/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/01/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/04/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/11/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/21/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/29/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/17/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/26/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/18/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/02/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/10/2000