Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 07/01/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 08/04/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/23/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/23/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/08/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/09/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/07/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/07/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/04/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 05/09/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 05/15/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/16/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/24/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/08/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/09/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/12/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/12/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/13/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/20/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/27/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 07/10/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/12/2000