Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/12/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/12/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 07/12/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/12/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/12/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/12/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 07/12/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 07/12/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 07/12/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/12/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/12/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/15/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/20/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/28/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/06/2000