Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 07/14/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 07/14/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 07/14/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/14/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 07/14/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 07/14/1999
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 07/14/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 07/14/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 07/14/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 07/14/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/14/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 10/28/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 10/28/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/22/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/22/2000
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/03/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/07/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/25/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/12/2000