Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 07/27/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 07/27/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 08/03/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 08/04/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/15/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/25/2000