Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/21/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 01/21/1999
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/26/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/09/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 01/24/2000