Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 07/29/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 08/03/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/09/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/09/1999
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 09/09/1999
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 10/20/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 10/21/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 10/21/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/25/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/09/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/16/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/24/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 02/24/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/01/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/09/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/09/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/04/2000
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 05/04/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/09/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/25/2000