Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 01/25/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/11/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/11/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/11/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/02/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/02/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/08/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/19/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/07/1999
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 01/31/2000