Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/07/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/25/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/05/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/05/2000
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/13/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/13/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/13/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/13/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/13/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/13/2000
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/14/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/14/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/14/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/19/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/20/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/22/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/22/2000
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/22/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/25/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 09/25/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/26/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/26/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/26/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/26/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/26/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/26/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/27/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/27/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/27/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/27/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/27/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/27/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/27/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/28/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/28/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 09/28/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/02/2000
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/02/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 10/02/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 10/03/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/03/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/03/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/03/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/03/2000
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/03/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/04/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/04/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/05/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/05/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/05/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/05/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/05/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/06/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/06/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/06/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 10/06/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/06/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 10/06/2000
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/06/2000
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 10/06/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 10/06/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/06/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 10/10/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/10/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/11/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 10/12/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/12/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/12/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/12/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/17/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/17/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/18/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/26/2000