Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 08/05/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/28/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/12/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/12/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/15/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/15/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/04/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/04/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/09/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/22/2000
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/04/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/23/2000