Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 09/24/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/24/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 10/07/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/21/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 10/29/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/16/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/08/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/10/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/23/2000
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/06/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/11/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/11/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/15/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/16/2000