Text: S.1638 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 106-276 (10/02/2000)

 
[106th Congress Public Law 276]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ276.106]

Public Law 106-276
106th Congress

                                 An Act


 
   To amend the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to 
 extend the retroactive eligibility dates for financial assistance for 
 higher education for spouses and dependent children of Federal, State, 
    and local law enforcement officers who are killed in the line of 
               duty. <<NOTE: Oct. 2, 2000 -  [S. 1638]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. EXTENSION OF RETROACTIVE ELIGIBILITY DATES FOR 
                            FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR HIGHER 
                            EDUCATION FOR SPOUSES AND CHILDREN OF 
                            LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS KILLED IN THE 
                            LINE OF DUTY.

    (a) In General.--Section 1216(a) of the Omnibus Crime Control and 
Safe Streets Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 3796d-5(a)) is amended--
            (1) by striking ``May 1, 1992'', and inserting ``January 1, 
        1978,'' ; and
            (2) by striking ``October 1, 1997,'' and inserting ``January 
        1, 1978,''.

    (b) Effective <<NOTE: 42 USC 3796d-5 note.>> Date.--The amendments 
made by subsection (a) shall take effect October 1, 1999.

    Approved October 2, 2000.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 1638 (H.R. 2059):
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 106-800 accompanying H.R. 2059 (Comm. on the 
Judiciary).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 146 (2000):
            May 15, considered and passed Senate.
            Sept. 19, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>